TN HB1685 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "travel promoter" and "travel services" for the purposes of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, redefines "travel promoter" and "travel services" for the purposes of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 698 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/15/2020 | |
2020-06-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1594 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 698