TN HB1681 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the board to develop a two-year pilot program to award grants to students enrolled in certain non-credit workforce training programs operated by a community college or Tennessee college of applied technology governed by the state university and community college system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1770 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee