TN HB1679 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to annually compile a list of courses that may be substituted for certain high school course requirements; requires the department, by April 15 of each year, to distribute the list to each LEA and public charter high school and to the Tennessee higher education commission for distribution to high school counselors and to public institutions of higher education in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to annually compile a list of courses that may be substituted for certain high school course requirements; requires the department, by April 15 of each year, to distribute the list to each LEA and public charter high school and to the Tennessee higher education commission for distribution to high school counselors and to public institutions of higher education in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0528) |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1816 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020