TN HB1672 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds coal ash and related coal combustion residuals to the definition of hazardous waste. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to coal ash.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2178 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee