TN HB1671 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding requirements given in invitations to bidders. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding requirements given in invitations to bidders. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 644
2014-03-24HouseComp. SB subst.
2014-03-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014
2014-03-19HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
2014-03-18HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2014-03-12HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014
2014-03-12HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2014-03-05HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
2014-01-29HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2014-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2014-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2014-01-16HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1713 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 644

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback