TN HB1669 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the Tennessee higher education commission to submit a report to the governor and speakers of the senate and house of representatives by December 31, 2023, on issues of food insecurity among students at public institutions of higher education in this state and that identifies and describes the efforts of the institutions to address food insecurity among students. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 50; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 53 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 50; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 53 and Title 71, relative to food insecurity at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 829 | |
2022-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1825 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 829