TN HB1667 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a Tennessee state library coordinator position within the department; establishes the duties of the Tennessee state library coordinator. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Tennessee state library coordinator.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1048 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0494) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2022-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0500) |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1784 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1048