TN HB1661 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a new offense of aggravated reckless driving. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 10, relative to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-12-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1673 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022