TN HB1654 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain persons. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, relative to transportation infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1009 | |
2022-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2022-03-01 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1668 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-11 - Effective date(s) 05/09/2022