TN HB1653 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain municipality located in a tier 3 enhancement county, acting through the authorization of the board of public utilities or other board or supervisory body having responsibility for the gas department or electric department, to loan funds from the gas department or electric department to an eligible industrial development corporation for the purpose of economic development or industrial development, or both, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.
Title
As enacted, authorizes certain municipality located in a tier 3 enhancement county, acting through the authorization of the board of public utilities or other board or supervisory body having responsibility for the gas department or electric department, to loan funds from the gas department or electric department to an eligible industrial development corporation for the purpose of economic development or industrial development, or both, in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Bass [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385 | |
2011-05-20 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 385