TN HB1652 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, names the entry driveway at the Bradley County Tennessee State Veterans Home the John Simmons Parkway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, names the entry driveway at the Bradley County Tennessee State Veterans Home the John Simmons Parkway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-02-20SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-02-10HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-02-06HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/10/2020
2020-02-05HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2020
2020-02-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-01-29HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/4/2020
2020-01-22HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2020-01-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1562 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback