TN HB1645 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of civil rights intimidation to create a Class D felony, punishable by a fine not to exceed $5,000, for taking adverse action, as defined in this bill, against an employee who has expressly objected to the COVID-19 vaccination based upon the employee's religious beliefs, creed, or conscience, with the intent to unlawfully intimidate or force the employee to obtain a COVID-19 vaccination. - Amends TCA Title 14, Chapter 3 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14, Chapter 3 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3, relative to adverse actions against employees due to COVID-19 vaccination status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee -- Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-11-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2831 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee