TN HB1642 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the Tennessee State Fairgrounds in Nashville as an urban park center; authorizes the granting of a franchise for the provision of food or beverage, including alcoholic beverages, on its premises; specifies that the holder of such franchise is also considered an urban park center; requires certain reporting. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, designates the Tennessee State Fairgrounds in Nashville as an urban park center; authorizes the granting of a franchise for the provision of food or beverage, including alcoholic beverages, on its premises; specifies that the holder of such franchise is also considered an urban park center; requires certain reporting. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY LAMBERTH PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY LAMBERTH PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 700 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 22, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 18, PNV 5 |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0773) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2485 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700