TN HB1639 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits this state or its political subdivisions from taking certain actions in response to the COVID-19 pandemic. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 5, Chapter 1; Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 5, Chapter 1; Title 6, Chapter 54 and Title 8, relative to governmental authority to mandate certain actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Withdrawn. |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-08-13 | House | Filed for introduction |