TN HB1634 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to include three non-binding questions related to the legalization of marijuana on the November 2022 ballot; requires the secretary of state to compile the results of the public policy opinion poll and forward the results to the members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to a public policy opinion poll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-07-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-07-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1973 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee