TN HB1631 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the state university and community college system, board of regents, for four years to June 30, 2022; requires the governor, in making appointments, to ensure that the state university boards are composed of members who are diverse in sex rather than in gender. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, extends the state university and community college system, board of regents, for four years to June 30, 2022; requires the governor, in making appointments, to ensure that the state university boards are composed of members who are diverse in sex rather than in gender. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703 | |
2018-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1553 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 703