TN HB1629 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 521
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 521
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to provide certain post-adoption services. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to provide certain post-adoption services. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 521 | |
2009-06-09 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-06-09 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 6/9/09 | |
2009-06-08 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Re-referred To: Government Operations Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1702 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 521
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1629&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1629.pdf |