TN HB1623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the comptroller of the treasury to conduct a performance audit of the department's office for civil rights every two years; requires the department to promulgate rules to assist the office for civil rights with effectuating the office's duty to ensure that the department and programs that receive funding from the department comply with federal civil rights laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the comptroller of the treasury to conduct a performance audit of the department's office for civil rights every two years; requires the department to promulgate rules to assist the office for civil rights with effectuating the office's duty to ensure that the department and programs that receive funding from the department comply with federal civil rights laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2283 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020