TN HB1622 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from $2.93 billion to $4 billion, the maximum aggregate principal amount for which the agency may issue bonds and notes at any one time. - Amends TCA Section 13-23-121.
Title
As enacted, increases, from $2.93 billion to $4 billion, the maximum aggregate principal amount for which the agency may issue bonds and notes at any one time. - Amends TCA Section 13-23-121.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 766 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-17 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 87, Nays 4 PNV 0 HB1622 |
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/17/20 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0592) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2020-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1576 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766