TN HB1621 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter by amendment. - Amends Chapter 322 of the Acts of 1903; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 322 of the Acts of 1903; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 132 of the Private Acts of 2006; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the City of Covington.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Pr. Ch. 25 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1643 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 25