TN HB1612 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires approval by the governing body of each local government in which a proposed user fee facility is located prior to development of the facility; removes authority of the department of transportation to expend funds from the transportation modernization fund to develop a user fee facility. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Section 12-2-112; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Section 12-2-112; Title 54 and Title 55, relative to the development of user fee facility projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-12-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1650 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee