TN HB1610 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes counties to hold referendum elections to authorize the growing, processing, manufacture, delivery, and retail sale of marijuana within jurisdictional boundaries; decriminalizes the possession of small amounts of marijuana statewide. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes counties to hold referendum elections to authorize the growing, processing, manufacture, delivery, and retail sale of marijuana within jurisdictional boundaries; decriminalizes the possession of small amounts of marijuana statewide. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-25HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2020
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1898 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback