TN HB1606 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the statutorily required notice period for termination of residential tenancy to three days in a county with a population more than 75,000 and to 14 days for all other counties in situations where an unauthorized subtenant refuses to vacate the premises. - Amends TCA Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the statutorily required notice period for termination of residential tenancy to three days in a county with a population more than 75,000 and to 14 days for all other counties in situations where an unauthorized subtenant refuses to vacate the premises. - Amends TCA Title 66.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020
2020-02-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020
2020-02-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-05HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/11/2020
2020-02-04HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2020-01-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/4/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1615 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/18/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback