TN HB1603 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of safety to report to the transportation committees of both houses by February 1, 2020, the number of commercial driver license holders who previously held military commercial driver licenses, and whether they experienced any barriers in applying for such state license. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of safety to report to the transportation committees of both houses by February 1, 2020, the number of commercial driver license holders who previously held military commercial driver licenses, and whether they experienced any barriers in applying for such state license. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-03-19 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1589 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0