TN HB1601 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requests the department of revenue to submit a one-time report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees of each house on or before March 1, 2020, projecting the number of current low-emission or low-emission and energy-efficient vehicles issued stickers to operate in the high occupancy vehicle lanes, and the projected number over the next four years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requests the department of revenue to submit a one-time report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees of each house on or before March 1, 2020, projecting the number of current low-emission or low-emission and energy-efficient vehicles issued stickers to operate in the high occupancy vehicle lanes, and the projected number over the next four years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1587 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.