TN HB1594 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, waives the application fee for an enhanced handgun carry permit for retired members of the military who are residents of the state. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, relative to handgun carry permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0262 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee