TN HB1591 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, if an appeal of a mandatory retention in third grade based on a student's scores on the ELA portion of the student's TCAP test is filed, it must be filed by the student's parent or guardian; requires an LEA or public charter school to include information about third grade retention in information the LEA or charter school must send to a student's parent upon determining that the student has a significant reading deficiency. - Amends Chapter 1 of the Public Acts of 2021 (1st Ex. Sess.); Chapter 3 of the Public Acts of 2021 (1st Ex. Sess.) and TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 9; and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 1 of the Public Acts of 2021 (1st Ex. Sess.); Chapter 3 of the Public Acts of 2021 (1st Ex. Sess.) and Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 9; and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31, relative to mandatory third grade retention.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 367 | |
2021-04-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-04-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to General Sub |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021; 07/01/2022