TN HB1588 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pay Equality Act." - Amends TCA Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Pay Equality Act." - Amends TCA Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-07HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1721 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback