TN HB1588 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee five years to June 30, 2018; requires the authority to appear before the joint government operations committees no later than December 31, 2016, to report on the Nashville Area Metropolitan Planning Organization regional transportation plan. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 29-20-107 and Title 64, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, extends the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee five years to June 30, 2018; requires the authority to appear before the joint government operations committees no later than December 31, 2016, to report on the Nashville Area Metropolitan Planning Organization regional transportation plan. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Section 29-20-107 and Title 64, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 761 | |
2016-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1530 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 761
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1588&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1588.pdf |