TN HB1585 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person convicted of a sexual offense involving a person under 13 years of age to undergo chemical castration treatment as a condition of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires a person convicted of a sexual offense involving a person under 13 years of age to undergo chemical castration treatment as a condition of parole. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2591 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee