TN HB1583 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires DCS to provide a residential mental health facility that contracts with DCS for provision of services to children in state custody education funding equal to the average daily rate of education funding. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-363.
Title
As introduced, requires DCS to provide a residential mental health facility that contracts with DCS for provision of services to children in state custody education funding equal to the average daily rate of education funding. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-363.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1666 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee