TN HB1578 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows voter who was issued an absentee ballot to vote a provisional ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301 and Section 2-7-112.
Title
As enacted, allows voter who was issued an absentee ballot to vote a provisional ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301 and Section 2-7-112.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726 | |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1690 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 726