TN HB1577 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Class E felony offense of purchasing, selling, possessing, or using a part, component, device, or attachment designed to accelerate the fire of a semi-automatic rifle and makes any semi-automatic rifle that includes an accelerated fire part, component, or device a prohibited weapon. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 38-3-119 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 38-3-119 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-10HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2024-01-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-04-13HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee
2023-04-13HouseSponsor change.
2023-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-13HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 4/13/2023
2023-04-05HouseRef. to Delayed Bills Committee
2023-04-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1566 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback