TN HB1577 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from $7.25 to $12, the minimum hourly wage for employees within the state. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, Chapter 2, relative to the minimum wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0195 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee