TN HB1573 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 691
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 691
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes surviving spouses of deceased national guard members to apply for issuance of national guard license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes surviving spouses of deceased national guard members to apply for issuance of national guard license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] |
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 691 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0744) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0863) |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1900 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 691