TN HB1572 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires elementary and secondary schools that receive public funding to ensure that student athletes participate in school-sanctioned sports based on the student's biological sex as indicated on certificate issued at time of birth; provides for the cessation and restoration of the school's public funding; establishes a civil penalty of not more than $10,000; requires a public official to vacate the official's office for taking certain actions contrary to the intent of the law. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires elementary and secondary schools that receive public funding to ensure that student athletes participate in school-sanctioned sports based on the student's biological sex as indicated on certificate issued at time of birth; provides for the cessation and restoration of the school's public funding; establishes a civil penalty of not more than $10,000; requires a public official to vacate the official's office for taking certain actions contrary to the intent of the law. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020
2020-05-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-12-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2077 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback