TN HB1568 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that hemp and products derived from hemp, other than isolated THC, are not subject to seizure based solely on their composition; prohibits police searches based solely on the odor of cannabis. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1045 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee