TN HB1567 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, establishes that juvenile court has concurrent jurisdiction with chancery and circuit courts relating to cases of adoption, pursuant to general law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relative to the jurisdiction of courts in Overton County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Pr. Ch. 23
2023-04-28 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-04-13SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-04-12SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-06HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2023
2023-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023
2023-04-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2023
2023-03-27HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-03-20HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1555 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback