TN HB1567 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of a free disabled veteran plate to certain veterans who have a service-connected disability. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of a free disabled veteran plate to certain veterans who have a service-connected disability. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-12-06 | House | Filed for introduction |