TN HB1566 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, authorizes the town to impose fees on the development of land to pay for capital improvement; authorizes the board of mayor and aldermen to appoint and remove all directors and department heads, upon majority vote; and replaces the town manager with the board as the appointing authority for the town recorder. - Amends Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended by Chapter 39 of the Private Acts of 2020 and Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 2022; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the Town of Oakland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Pr. Ch. 30
2023-05-11 Signed by Governor.
2023-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-20SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2023-04-20SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2023-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0411)
2023-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023
2023-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2023
2023-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2023
2023-03-27HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-03-20HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1554 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 30

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback