TN HB1565 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "prior convictions" for multiple offenders as convictions within the past 10 years; defines "prior convictions" for persistent offenders as convictions within the past 15 years. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to sentencing.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/19/2022 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee