TN HB1565 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates appointment process for vacant citizen member positions on the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, creates appointment process for vacant citizen member positions on the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1583 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - 989Pub. Ch. 989