TN HB1563 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, requires the civil service board to meet semi annually rather then annually; designates the county mayor as the board secretary, to replace the county human resources director; removes board authority to hold performance examinations to determine qualifications for employment; deletes competitive promotion examination requirements; provides for a right of appeals upon a suspension of an employee by the sheriff. - Amends Chapter 26 of the Private Acts of 2007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Chapter 26 of the Private Acts of 2007; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Maury County Sheriff's Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Pr. Ch. 20
2023-04-28 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-04-13SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-04-05SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-03HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 4
2023-03-30HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-20HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-03-16HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-03-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1550 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback