TN HB1562 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a commissioner or deputy commissioner who administers contracts of a department from accepting employment with a private business that contracts with the department for 12 months after the commissioner's or deputy commissioner's departure from public office. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 3; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 3; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 50, relative to commissioners of the departments of state government.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0954 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee