TN HB1556 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds acupuncture, chiropractic, occupational therapy, and physical therapy services performed by authorized persons to the list of healthcare services that may be included as covered TennCare medical assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, adds acupuncture, chiropractic, occupational therapy, and physical therapy services performed by authorized persons to the list of healthcare services that may be included as covered TennCare medical assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-14 | House | Re-ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 1/29/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1743 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020