TN HB1555 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes that general sessions court has concurrent jurisdiction with chancery and circuit courts relating to cases of adoption, pursuant to general law.
Title
AN ACT relative to the jurisdiction of the Courts of White County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Pr. Ch. 15 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Reset on Consent cal. for 3/30/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1540 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 15