TN HB1555 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseWithdrawn.
2018-02-20HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 2/20/2018
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
2018-01-19HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1634 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-20 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback