TN HB1551 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors who are prohibited from practicing law from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors who are prohibited from practicing law from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-08-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1745 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback