TN HB1551 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces references to various divisions and programs to reflect new structure of divisions within the department and to reflect appropriate name of federal programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14 and Section 8-35-221(a).
Title
As enacted, replaces references to various divisions and programs to reflect new structure of divisions within the department and to reflect appropriate name of federal programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14 and Section 8-35-221(a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2555 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 599