TN HB1550 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Failed for lack of second in: Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes the Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes the Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26HouseFailed for lack of second in: Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-04HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2020-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-08-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1787 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback